Waters v. Raymond, et al.

Plaintiff: Larry Dewayne Waters
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center, Marty Boyd, T Raymond and Keith Bowers
Case Number: 3:2019cv00113
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Patricia S Harris
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Keith Bowers, Marty Boyd, T Raymond.(Davis, JaNan)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by JaNan Arnold Davis on behalf of Keith Bowers, Marty Boyd, T Raymond (Davis, JaNan)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Keith Bowers served on 5/13/2019. (fjg)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Marty Boyd served on 5/13/2019. (fjg)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed. T Raymond served on 5/13/2019. (fjg)
April 26, 2019 Summons Issued as to Keith Bowers, Marty Boyd, T Raymond and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (cmn)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for the defendants and the United States Marshal is directed to serve a copy of #4 Amended Complaint and summons on defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 4/26/2019. (jak)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Larry Dewayne Waters. (llg)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS. Granting #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's custodian is directed to collect monthly payments from his institutional account and forward them to the Clerk of Court until a total of $350 has been paid. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Craighead County Sheriff. Waters must file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Waters a blank 1983 form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 4/16/2019. (jak)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Craighead County Detention Center filed by Larry Dewayne Waters. (ljb)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Larry Dewayne Waters. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waters v. Raymond, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Dewayne Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Boyd
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Raymond
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Bowers
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?