Ward v. Craighead County Detention Center
Plaintiff: Marvin Ward
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2019cv00131
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jak)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 JUDGMENT consistent with #5 Order, this case is hereby dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/23/2019. (jak)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER adopting #4 Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects. This case is dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/23/2019. (jak)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that Mr. Ward's lawsuit be dismissed, without prejudice, for failure to state a federal claim for relief. The Court further recommends that this dismissal count as a STRIKE under the Prison Litigation Act. Objections due 14 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 5/6/2019. (jak)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS. Granting #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The Court assesses an initial partial filing payment of $10.27. Plaintiff's custodians are directing the collect the initial payment immediately and the balance of the $350 filing fee by deducting monthly payments from his prison trust account and forwarding them to the Clerk of the Court. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Craighead County Detention Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 5/2/2019. (jak)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Marvin Ward.(jak)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marvin Ward. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?