Williams et al v. Bank of America NA et al
Plaintiff: Erich Williams and Shirley Williams
Defendant: Wilson & Associates PLLC and Bank of America NA
Case Number: 3:2019cv00152
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, #16 Brief in Support by Erich Williams, Shirley Williams (Rogers, Sara)
July 9, 2019 Filing 17 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 8/21/2019. Rule 26(f) Report due by 9/4/2019. Proposed Bench Trial date set for week of 5/4/2020 at 9:15 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 7/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order) (cdw)
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Bank of America NA. (Horton, Johnathan)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Bank of America NA (Horton, Johnathan)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Extend Time. Bank of America will have up to and including June 28, 2019 in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 6/24/19. (amr)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time Defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by Bank of America NA (Horton, Johnathan)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 and #11 Motions to admit counsel pro hac vice. Simon Fleischmann and Gregory T. Noorigian are hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 6/6/2019. (jak)
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Gregory T. Noorigian. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3473689. Filed by Bank of America NA (Horton, Johnathan)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Simon Fleischmann. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3473684. Filed by Bank of America NA (Horton, Johnathan)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Wilson & Associates PLLC. (High, Samuel)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wilson & Associates PLLC (High, Samuel)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Scott High on behalf of Wilson & Associates PLLC (High, Samuel)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Time. The Court, being advised that Plaintiff has no objection, extends the time for Defendant Bank of America, N.A. to respond to the complaint until June 24, 2019. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/29/19. (dpb)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Extend Time or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Bank of America NA (Horton, Johnathan)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Judy Simmons Henry on behalf of Bank of America NA (Henry, Judy)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 ADDENDUM filed by Bank of America NA to #1 Notice of Removal. Supplement to Notice of Removal (Horton, Johnathan)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 VERIFIED PETITION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER against All Defendants filed by Erich Williams, Shirley Williams. (ljb)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bank of America NA from Crittenden County Circuit Court, Case Number 18CV-19-385. Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT072213. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. Bank of America NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson & Associates PLLC
Represented By: Samuel Scott High
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Simon Fleischmann
Represented By: Judy Simmons Henry
Represented By: Gregory T Noorigian
Represented By: Johnathan D. Horton
Represented By: Gregory T. Noorigian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erich Williams
Represented By: Sara Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Williams
Represented By: Sara Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?