Carter v. BPL Plasma Inc
Plaintiff: Andre Carter
Defendant: BPL Plasma Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00174
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 15 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 9/16/2019. Bench Trial set for 2/8/2021 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 8/2/2019. (slb)
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 Response to Motion filed by Andre Carter. (jak)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Andre Carter. (jak)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed. BPL Plasma Inc served on 7/1/2019. (fjg)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE to the Court by Andre Carter.(jak)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by BPL Plasma Inc (Jones, Justin)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 Motion to Dismiss filed by BPL Plasma Inc. (Jones, Justin)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by BPL Plasma Inc (Jones, Justin)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Jones on behalf of BPL Plasma Inc (Jones, Justin)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE to the Court by Andre Carter. (jak)
June 18, 2019 Summons Issued as to BPL Plasma Inc. Forwarded to USMS for service. (kdr)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Taking his papers as a whole, Carter has pleaded a plausible claim for discrimination under Title VII and maybe a retaliation claim. The Clerk should prepare and deliver summons, along with copies of the complaint, this Order, and Carter's #4 notice to the U.S. Marshal for service on BPL Plasma Inc, without prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/17/2019. (jak)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to the Court by Andre Carter. (jak)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER provisionally granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, pursuant to General Order No. 29. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 6/6/2019. (jak)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT UNDER TITLE VII OF THE CIVIL RIGHTS ACT OF 1964 against All Defendants, filed by Andre Carter.(jak)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andre Carter.(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. BPL Plasma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BPL Plasma Inc
Represented By: Justin Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?