Drs Kiran & Pallavi Patel 2017 Foundation for Global Understanding Inc v. Hunt et al
Plaintiff: Drs Kiran & Pallavi Patel 2017 Foundation for Global Understanding Inc
Defendant: Hunt Hospitality Jonesboro AR LLC, Melissa D Hunt and David B Hunt
Case Number: 3:2019cv00175
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 JUDGMENT: The case is dismissed with prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction until 8/2/2019 to enforce the parties' settlement agreement. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/2/2019. (jak)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Drs Kiran & Pallavi Patel 2017 Foundation for Global Understanding Inc. (Thalheimer, Mary)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Drs Kiran & Pallavi Patel 2017 Foundation for Global Understanding Inc, David B Hunt, Melissa D Hunt, Hunt Hospitality Jonesboro AR LLC. (jak)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/5/2019. Bench Trial set for 11/2/2020 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 6/20/2019. (slb)
June 17, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #7 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to establish linkage to #3 Amended Complaint. (jak)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 OBJECTIONS by David B Hunt, Melissa D Hunt (Miller, Lance)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by David B Hunt, Melissa D Hunt.(Miller, Lance)(Docket text modified on 6/17/2019 to establish linkage) (jak)
June 10, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #5 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the party filer as Hunt Hospitality Jonesboro AR LLC as marked on the document. (jak)
June 10, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Notice of Removal. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the party filers as David B Hunt and Melissa D Hunt. (thd)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of David B Hunt in Support of #1 Defendants' Notice of Removal. (kdr)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by Hunt Hospitality Jonesboro AR LLC.(kdr) (Docket text modified on 6/10/2019 to correct the party filers) (jak)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Kiran Patel by Drs Kiran & Pallavi Patel 2017 Foundation for Global Understanding Inc. (kdr)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Foreclosure and Replevin against All Defendants, filed by Drs Kiran & Pallavi Patel 2017 Foundation for Global Understanding Inc.(kdr)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Drs Kiran & Pallavi Patel 2017 Foundation for Global Understanding Inc.(kdr)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by David B Hunt and Melissa D Hunt from Craighead County Circuit Court, case number 16JCV-19-345. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt number LIT072514. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) (Docket entry modified on 6/10/2019 to correct the party filers.) (thd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drs Kiran & Pallavi Patel 2017 Foundation for Global Understanding Inc v. Hunt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunt Hospitality Jonesboro AR LLC
Represented By: Lance R. Miller
Represented By: Stanley Dale Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa D Hunt
Represented By: Lance R. Miller
Represented By: Stanley Dale Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B Hunt
Represented By: Lance R. Miller
Represented By: Stanley Dale Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drs Kiran & Pallavi Patel 2017 Foundation for Global Understanding Inc
Represented By: Thomas Christoph Keller
Represented By: David B. Vandergriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?