Patton v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Magen Patton
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00176
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2019 Filing 10 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 11/2/2020 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Discovery due by 6/5/2020. Motions due by 7/6/2020. Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 10/1/2020. Signed at the direction of the Court on 7/13/2019. (slb)
July 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Joint 26(f) report, No. #8 , noted. The Court prefers its deadlines. A Final Scheduling Order will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/13/2019. (slb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Miller, Stuart)
July 8, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #7 Initial Scheduling Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the type of trial as "BENCH TRIAL" as marked on the Order. (jak)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/19/2019. Bench Trial set for 11/2/2020 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) # 324 before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 7/5/2019. (slb)(Docket text modified on 7/8/2019 to correct the type of trial as Bench Trial)(jak)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 RECEIPT FILED: $400.00, receipt number LIT072615. (Original receipt mailed) (llg)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (jak)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(jak)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart P. Miller on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (jak)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Magen Patton.(jak)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company from Mississippi County Circuit Court, case number 47BCV-19-111. (Fee of $400 received) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patton v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magen Patton
Represented By: James W. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Stuart P. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?