Jetton General Contracting Inc v. Mangum
Plaintiff: Jetton General Contracting Inc
Defendant: Markeith Mangum
Case Number: 3:2019cv00177
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement by Jetton General Contracting Inc (Peoples, Ashley)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Joint motion, No. #5 , granted. Answer or Rule 12(b) motion due by 12 August 2019. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/8/2019. (slb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Counterclaim by Jetton General Contracting Inc (Peoples, Ashley)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to #2 Complaint , First COUNTERCLAIM (Verified) against Jetton General Contracting Inc by Markeith Mangum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verification Page - Markeith Mangum)(Crone, Alan)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 RECEIPT FILED: $400.00, receipt number LIT072616. (Original receipt mailed) (llg)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 VERIFIED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Jetton General Contracting Inc.(jak)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Markeith Mangum from Greene County Circuit Court, case number CV19-130. (Fee of $400 received) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jetton General Contracting Inc v. Mangum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Markeith Mangum
Represented By: Alan G. Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jetton General Contracting Inc
Represented By: Ashley D. Peoples
Represented By: Breanna R. Trombley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?