Webster v. Doe
Plaintiff: Gary Leon Webster
Defendant: Doe
Case Number: 3:2019cv00185
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 14 CORRECTED ORDER of USCA as to #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Gary Leon Webster: Appellant is directed to pay to the Clerk of the United States District Court the appellate docketing fee of $505, or to file a pleading in this court explaining whyAppellant is eligible to proceed without pre-payment of the fee within 30 days of the date of this order. (cmn)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER of USCA: The Clerk of the district court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER as to #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Gary Leon Webster. (cmn)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER of USCA as to #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Gary Leon Webster: Appellant is directed to pay to the Clerk of the United States District Court the appellate docketing fee of $505, or to file a pleading in this court explaining why Appellant is eligible to proceed without pre-payment of the fee within 30 days of the date of this order. (cmn)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 USCA Docketing Letter as to #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Gary Leon Webster. USCA Case Number 19-2572. (cmn)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to #5 Notice of Appeal re #2 Order and #3 Judgment. (cmn)
July 24, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #9 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the document was filed in error - duplicate of #8 Order. (kbc)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD (duplicate entry). (jak) Docket entry modified on 7/24/2019 to indicate document filed in error. (kbc)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #7 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/24/2019. (cmn)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Gary Leon Webster. (cmn)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. Response due by 8/16/2019. (cmn)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #2 Order and #3 Judgment by Gary Leon Webster. (cmn)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jak)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 JUDGMENT: Webster's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/27/2019. (jak)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER dismissing without prejudice Webster's complaint. If Webster wants to pursue this case, then he must pay the $400 filing and administrative fees and file a motion to reopen by 7/27/2019. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/27/2019. (jak)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Doe, filed by Gary Leon Webster.(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webster v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Leon Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?