MT Carriers LLC v. White
Plaintiff: MT Carriers LLC
Defendant: Casper White
Case Number: 3:2019cv00187
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Casper White. Joint Report noting conflict with proposed trial date (Cunningham, Joseph)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 10/21/2019; Rule 26(f) Report due by 11/4/2019; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 10/19/2020 at 09:00 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) # 324 before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 08/21/2019. (tmw)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Evan Stallings on behalf of Casper White (Stallings, Mark)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Casper White.(Cunningham, Joseph)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Cotten Cunningham on behalf of Casper White (Cunningham, Joseph)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by MT Carriers LLC. Casper White served on 7/10/2019. (jak)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 RECEIPT FILED: $400.00, receipt number LIT072832. (original mailed) (bmd)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by MT Carriers LLC. (Fee of $400 received; Summons Issued and returned to Plaintiff's counsel for service). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MT Carriers LLC v. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MT Carriers LLC
Represented By: Christopher Richard Heil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casper White
Represented By: Joseph Cotten Cunningham
Represented By: Mark Evan Stallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?