Kirby v. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Plaintiff: Ashley Kirby
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Case Number: 3:2019cv00188
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER finding as moot #16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Jerry Garner is not listed as an attorney of record for Plaintiffs in this case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/12/19. (amr)
August 7, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Steadman, Timothy)
August 1, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jerry Garner by Ashley Kirby (Holleman, John)
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Grabenstein, Casey)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 and #13 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/26/2019. (jak)
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Casey Grabenstein. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3502905. Filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Miller, Stuart)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by James Morsch. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3502899. Filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Miller, Stuart)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to #10 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge James M. Moody Jr. (jak)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER transferring this case to the Honorable James M. Moody Jr. Any objection to transfer should be made by 7/31/2019, and Judge Moody will address it. The Court directs the Clerk to make the transfer by chip exchange. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/22/2019. (jak)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motion, No. #8 , granted. Reply due by 29 July 2019. In the future, any movant may reply within seven calendar days of a response. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/19/2019. (slb)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Miller, Stuart)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Steadman, Timothy)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Miller, Stuart)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Miller, Stuart)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Miller, Stuart)
July 1, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT." (thd)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart P. Miller on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (kdr)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, filed by Ashley Kirby.(kdr) (Docket text modified on 7/1/2019 to correct the description of the document filed.)(thd).
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois from Craighead County Circuit Court, case number 16JCV-19-546. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT072785. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirby v. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: Stuart P. Miller
Represented By: James Andrew Morsch
Represented By: Casey Thomas Grabenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Kirby
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Represented By: John Holleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?