Clark v. Hitts et al
Plaintiff: Chaddrick Clark
Defendant: Becky Hitts, Doyle Ramey and Kevin Moulder
Case Number: 3:2019cv00210
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Chaddrick Clark re #3 Recommended Disposition. (fjg)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that Mr. Clark's claims be dismissed, without prejudice, based on his failure to comply with the Court's 7/30/2019 Order and his failure to prosecute this lawsuit. Objections due 14 days from the date of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/3/2019. (jak)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS. The Clerk of Court is directed to enclose an IFP application along with a copy of this Order. Plaintiff is directed to return a completed IFP application, including an accompanying affidavit and jail account information sheet, or pay a $400.00 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/30/2019. (jak)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Chaddrick Clark.(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Hitts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becky Hitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doyle Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Moulder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chaddrick Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?