Estate of Elja McDonald v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Estate of Elja McDonald
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00212
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 E-MAIL received from U.S. District Court Northern District of California, confirming the case was received and opened in their district as case number 3:19-cv-05380. (jak)
August 2, 2019 Docket Note: Pursuant to #3 Conditional Transfer Order, this case was transferred to the U.S. District Court Northern District of California on this date as part of MDL No. 2741. (jak)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-144) transferring this case to the U.S. District Court Northern District of California as part of MDL No. 2741. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 8/2/2019. (jak)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The original civil cover sheet was submitted in error (lack of conventional signature). The correct civil cover sheet was added to docket entry #1 based on the attached correspondence. (jak)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Monsanto Company, filed by Estate of Elja McDonald. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT073131. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/24/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet Correct (submitted 7/24/2019)) (jak).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Elja McDonald v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Elja McDonald
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Represented By: Andrew T. Kagan
Represented By: Sarah Coppola Jewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?