Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company et al v. Jackson et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company and Allstate Indemnity Company
Defendant: Myers Flying Service Inc, Celia Overton, Darrell Tillman LLC, Darrell Tillman, Chad Tillman, Pete Myers, Jackson House Holdings LLC, Samuel Jackson, Sam Tillman Farms LLC and Myles Overton
Case Number: 3:2019cv00213
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin N. Joy on behalf of Darrell Tillman LLC, Sam Tillman Farms LLC, Chad Tillman, Darrell Tillman (Joy, Justin)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Samuel Jackson, Jackson House Holdings LLC.(Coleman, Robert)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. Coleman on behalf of Samuel Jackson, Jackson House Holdings LLC (Coleman, Robert)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Strabala, Richard)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Pete Myers, Myers Flying Service Inc.(Bacon, Donald)
July 24, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include a reference to the Jury Demand. (thd)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Allstate Indemnity Company and Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT073136. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) (Docket text modified on 7/24/2019 to include a reference to the Jury Demand.) (thd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company et al v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myers Flying Service Inc
Represented By: Donald H. Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celia Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Tillman LLC
Represented By: Justin N. Joy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Tillman
Represented By: Justin N. Joy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Tillman
Represented By: Justin N. Joy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Myers
Represented By: Donald H. Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson House Holdings LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Jackson
Represented By: Robert L. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Tillman Farms LLC
Represented By: Justin N. Joy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myles Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard Shane Strabala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Richard Shane Strabala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?