MoveCo.net LLC v. Dennis et al
Plaintiff: MoveCo.net LLC
Defendant: Janet M Dennis and Wiseway Motor Freight Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00218
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motions, Nos. #8 & #9 , granted. Mr. H.N. Cunningham III and Mr. Robert H. Bezucha are admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 08/19/2019.(crw)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Robert H. Bezucha. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3519495. Filed by MoveCo.net LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cunningham, H.)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by H.N. Cunningham, III. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3519467. Filed by MoveCo.net LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cunningham, H.)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 RECEIPT FILED: $600, receipt number LIT073415. (bmd)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Don A. Smith on behalf of MoveCo.net LLC (Smith, Don)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #1 Complaint and #2 and #3 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice lack an original signature (F.R.Cv.P. 11(a) and Local Rule 5.5(c)(1)). (thd)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motions, Nos. #2 & #3 , denied without prejudice. The Court prefers designation of an attorney who maintains an office in Arkansas. Local Rule 83.5(d), para. 2. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/5/2019. (slb)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Robert Bezucha filed by MoveCo.net LLC. Fee of $100 received. (jak) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct (submitted 8/8/2019)) (jak).
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by H. N. Cunningham III filed by MoveCo.net LLC. Fee of $100 received (jak)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by MoveCo.net LLC. (Fee of $400 received; Summons issued and returned to Plaintiff's counsel for service). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2019: #2 Main Document - Correct (submitted 8/8/2019)) (jak).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MoveCo.net LLC v. Dennis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet M Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wiseway Motor Freight Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MoveCo.net LLC
Represented By: H. N. Cunningham, III
Represented By: Robert Bezucha
Represented By: Don A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?