Galloway v. Greyhound Lines Inc et al
Plaintiff: Keith Galloway
Defendant: Giovanni Torres, Giovanni Torresroman, Blue Holdings LP, Sky Transportation Services Inc, John Adams Prince, III and Greyhound Lines Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00220
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #9 Affidavit of Service. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to remove duplicate text. (jak)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Notice, No. #11 , appreciated. Motion to dismiss two of the five defendants due by 28 October 2019. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/26/2019. (slb)
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement as to Certain Parties- Greyhound Lines, Inc., and John Adams Prince, III by Keith Galloway (Graham, Kevin)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Keith Galloway as to Giovanni Torres. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Amy C. Salazar, #2 Affidavit AI Legal Services)(Graham, Kevin)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, filed by Keith Galloway. Sky Transportation Services Inc served on 7/8/2019. (Graham, Kevin) (Docket text modified on 9/27/2019 to remove duplicate text)(jak)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint, filed by Keith Galloway. Blue Holdings LP served on 7/8/2019. (Graham, Kevin)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, filed by Keith Galloway. John Adams Prince, III served on 7/15/2019. (Graham, Kevin)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Keith Galloway. Greyhound Lines Inc served on 7/2/2019., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keith Galloway. Greyhound Lines Inc served on 7/2/2019. (Graham, Kevin)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Blue Holdings LP, Sky Transportation Services Inc.(Wyatt, Carl)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl K. Wyatt, Jr on behalf of Blue Holdings LP, Sky Transportation Services Inc (Wyatt, Carl)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 RECEIPT FILED: $400, receipt number LIT073416. (bmd)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Keith Galloway.(jak)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sky Transportation Services Inc from Crittenden County Circuit Court, case number 18CV-19-518. (Fee of $400 received) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galloway v. Greyhound Lines Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giovanni Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giovanni Torresroman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Holdings LP
Represented By: Carl K. Wyatt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sky Transportation Services Inc
Represented By: Carl K. Wyatt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Adams Prince, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greyhound Lines Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Galloway
Represented By: Kevin N. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?