Harris v. Rains et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence Harris
Defendant: Vallard, Rains, Stanfield and White
Case Number: 3:2019cv00233
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that #2 Complaint be dismissed without prejudice and that the Court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order adopting this Recommendation and the accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Objections due 14 days from the date of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/1/2019. (jak)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit #1 . Plaintiff shall submit within 30 days of the date of this order either: (1) the statutory filing fee of $400; or (2) a proper and complete Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit, with the required calculation sheet and certified copy of his trust fund account statement for the preceding six months. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 8/26/2019. (lej)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The original document was submitted in error - wrong image file - due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to #2 and hereto for service/review by the parties. (kbc)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Lawrence Harris. (llg) Additional attachment added on 8/23/2019: #1 Main Document - Correct. (kbc)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lawrence Harris. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Rains et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vallard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rains
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?