Afzal Traders LLC v. Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas LLC
Plaintiff: Azfal Traders LLC
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00247
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/6/2019. Bench Trial set for 6/7/2021 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 10/23/2019. (slb)
September 29, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Afzal Traders LLC.(Thomas, Jeremy)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #2 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Afzal Traders LLC by Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas LLC.(Falasco, Joseph)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, No. #3 , granted. Answer or Rule 12(b) motion due by 26 September 2019. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/16/2019. (slb)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas LLC (Falasco, Joseph)
September 9, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the spelling of Plaintiff's name to be "Afzal Traders LLC". (thd)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas LLC, filed by Afzal Traders LLC.(kdr) (Docket text modified on 9/9/2019 to correct Plaintiff's name.) (thd).
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas LLC from Mississippi County Circuit Court, Case Number 47OCV-19-75. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT073782. Summons not issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Afzal Traders LLC v. Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Azfal Traders LLC
Represented By: Jeremy Michael Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of Arkansas LLC
Represented By: Joseph R. Falasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?