Brown v. Rorex et al
Plaintiff: Michael Edward Brown
Defendant: Steve Rorex, Patrishia Marshall, Becky Hitt and Doyle Ramey
Case Number: 3:2019cv00249
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending #5 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint against Defendants be DISMISSED without prejudice, for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Dismissal of this action constitute a strike within the meaning of the Prison Litigation Reform Act. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from an Order and Judgment dismissing this action would not be taken in good faith. Objections are due Clerk no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/04/2019. (lmc) (Docket text modified on 11/5/2019 to correct a typographical error) (jak)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST for Forms by Michael Edward Brown. (llg)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff shall have one final opportunity in which to submit an Amended Complaint in accordance with the directions set forth in this Order, within 30 days of the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order shall result in the dismissal without prejudice of Plaintiff's Complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 09/30/2019. (lmc)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael Edward Brown.(jak)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 09/16/2019. (lmc)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the $350 filing fee for this action. Plaintiff's custodian is directed to collect monthly payments from his prison trust account and forward them to the Clerk of the Court until a total of $350 has been paid. Plaintiff is directed to file an amended complaint within 30 days from the date of this Order. The Clerk shall mail plaintiff a 1983 Complaint form. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Poinsett County Detention Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/16/2019. (jak)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael Edward Brown.(kdr)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Edward Brown. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Rorex et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Rorex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrishia Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becky Hitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doyle Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Edward Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?