Hurd v. Equifax Information Services LLC
Plaintiff: Philip Lee Hurd
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00261
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 12 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to instructions from the Court, this case is transferred to the docket of Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 11/15/2019. (jak)
November 15, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #11 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to remove duplicate text. (jak)
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Scott, Ralph) (Docket text modified on 11/15/2019 to remove duplicate text) (jak)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, No. #8 , granted. Answer or Rule 12(b) motion due by 14 November 2019. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/25/2019. (slb)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Equifax Information Services LLC (Scott, Ralph)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Equifax Information Services LLC (Scott, Ralph)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger D. Rowe on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC (Rowe, Roger)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ralph D. Scott, III on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC (Scott, Ralph)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motion, No. #4 , denied without prejudice. The Court prefers designation of an attorney who maintains an office in Arkansas. Local Rule 83.5(d), para. 2. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/23/2019. (slb)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Joseph L. Gentilcore. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-3564044. Filed by Philip Lee Hurd (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Larry)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 RECEIPT FILED: $400, receipt number LIT074118 (bmd)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Larry Paul Smith on behalf of Philip Lee Hurd (Smith, Larry)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Philip Lee Hurd. (Fee of $400 received; Summons issued and returned to Plaintiff's counsel for service) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurd v. Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Lee Hurd
Represented By: David M. Marco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?