McMullan v. Mapes et al
Plaintiff: Nathan Zachary McMullan
Defendant: Mapes, Lane, McCorkely and Bowers
Case Number: 3:2019cv00284
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Summons Issued as to Lane, McCorkely. And forwarded to USMS for service. (ajt)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for the Defendants Lane and McCorkely; and directing United States Marshal to serve a copy of #2 Complaint and summons without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/17/2019. (ajt)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending #2 Defendants Mapes and Bowers be DISMISSED from this action, without prejudice. All claims other than the First Amendment claims against Defendants Lane and McCorkely be DISMISSED without prejudice. Objections are due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/10/2019. (lmc)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 ADDENDUM to #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nathan Zachary McMullan. (llg)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's custodian is directed to collect an initial partial filing fee of $1.68 and forward that amount along with future monthly payments from Plaintiff's institutional account to the Clerk of Court until a total of $350 has been collected. Plaintiff is directed to file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk shall mail Plaintiff the Court-provided 1983 complaint form. The Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Order to the Northeast Arkansas Community Correction Center. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/28/2019. (jak)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/28/2019. (lmc)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT in Support #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nathan Zachary McMullan. (kdr)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Nathan Zachary McMullan.(kdr)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nathan Zachary McMullan. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMullan v. Mapes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Zachary McMullan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mapes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCorkely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?