Treadway et al v. Bill's Super Foods Inc et al
Plaintiff: Holly Treadway and Christian Manna
Defendant: Bill's Super Foods Inc and Billy Ray Orr
Case Number: 3:2019cv00321
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, No. #3 , granted. Answer or Rule 12(b) motion due by 15 January 2020. Statute of limitations tolled as agreed. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/13/2019. (slb)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Stipulation for Tolling by Christian Manna, Holly Treadway (Sanford, Joshua)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #1 Civil Cover Sheet lacks an original signature (F.R.Cv.P. 11(a) and Local Rule 5.65(c)(1)). (jak)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT - COLLECTIVE ACTION against All Defendants filed by Holly Treadway, Christian Manna. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT074770.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet Main Document - Correct (submitted 11/13/2019)) (jak).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Treadway et al v. Bill's Super Foods Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill's Super Foods Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Ray Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Treadway
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Daniel D. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Manna
Represented By: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Daniel D. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?