Department of Labor v. Nu-Way Products Company Inc
Plaintiff: Department of Labor
Defendant: Nu-Way Products Company Inc and Nu-Way Products Company Inc doing business as Nu-Way Pool & Spa
Case Number: 3:2019cv00322
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AGREED ORDER OF INJUNCTION. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/6/2019. (kdr)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodrick D. Holmes on behalf of Nu-Way Products Company Inc (Holmes, Rodrick)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court congratulates the parties on their agreed resolution. The Court requests some minor changes in the draft injunction. Post-injunction joint status report due by 1/27/2020. If all's well then, the Court will vacate the injunction based on the changed circumstances and dismiss the petition without prejudice. The 12/17/2019 hearing is cancelled. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/22/2019. (jak)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION Agreed Order of Injunction by Department of Labor. (Hairston, Amy)
November 21, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 Affidavit of Service. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the party served as Nu-Way Products Company Inc. as marked on the document. (jak)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Petition, memorandum, order , filed by Department of Labor. Nu-Way Products Company Inc. served on 11/18/2019. (Hairston, Amy)(Docket text modified on 11/21/2019 to correct the party that was served) (jak)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Petition for injunction, #1 , noted. The Court will hold a hearing on the petition on 12/17/2019 at 10:00 a.m. in the Jonesboro Federal Building in courtroom 324. Each party and its lawyer must appear. The Department must make good personal service of its petition, memorandum, and this Order on Nu-Way by close of business on 11/19/2019. Proof of service due by 11/22/2019. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/14/2019. (jak)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OF LAW re #1 Petition For Injunction filed by Department of Labor. (wbb)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR INJUNCTION TO RESTRAIN IMMINENT DANGER against Nu-Way Products Company Inc, filed by Department of Labor. (Summons not issued) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Department of Labor v. Nu-Way Products Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nu-Way Products Company Inc
Represented By: Rodrick D. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nu-Way Products Company Inc doing business as Nu-Way Pool & Spa
Represented By: Rodrick D. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Department of Labor
Represented By: Amy S. Hairston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?