Miller v. Molder et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Miller
Defendant: Trish Marshal, Kevin Molder, Doyle Ramey and Steve Roex
Case Number: 3:2019cv00328
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Plaintiff must, within 30 days of the entry of this order, either pay the $400 filing and administrative fees in full or file an Amended Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. If Plaintiff wishes to amend his complaint, he may complete the new complaint form in its entirety in accordance with the 11/18/2019 order, mark it as "Amended Complaint," and file it within 30 days of the date of this order. If he does not timely do so, dismissal of this case will be recommended. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/30/2019. (lej)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher Miller. (cmn)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting Plaintiff's IFP Application #1 . Service is not appropriate at this time. If Plaintiff wishes to amend his complaint, he may complete the new complaint form in its entirety in accordance with this order, mark it as "Amended Complaint," and file it within 30 days of the date of this order. Plaintiff's complaint, as it now stands, is deficient, and may be dismissed after 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 11/18/2019. (lej)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Christopher Miller.(wbb)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Miller. (wbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Molder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trish Marshal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Molder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doyle Ramey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Roex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?