Webster v. Sailor
Plaintiff: Gary Leon Webster
Defendant: Cameron Sailor
Case Number: 3:2019cv00332
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. Response due by 1/21/2020.(ajt)
December 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #2 Order and #3 Judgment 1983 by Gary Leon Webster. (ajt)
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 OBJECTIONS by Gary Leon Webster re #2 Order and #3 Judgment 1983. (ajt)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (ljb)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 JUDGMENT: Consistent with #2 order entered today, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/25/2019. (ljb)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER dismissing, without prejudice, #1 Webster's complaint; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this order and accompanying judgment would not be taken in good faith. If Webster would like to continue with this case, he must first pay the filing fee of $400 to the clerk within 30 days of the date of this order along with a motion to reopen this case. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/25/2019. (ljb)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cameron Sailor filed by Gary Leon Webster. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webster v. Sailor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Leon Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron Sailor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?