Martin v. Does
Plaintiff: Byron Martin
Defendant: Craighead County Jail and John Does
Case Number: 3:2019cv00366
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Plaintiff must file, within 60 days of the date of this order, a motion for service containing at least one Doe Defendant's name and service address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/4/2020. (lej)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff be allowed to proceed with his 1983 inadequate medical care and excessive force claims against Defendants in their individual capacities only. Plaintiff's official capacity claims against Defendants be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from any order adopting these recommendations would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/4/2020. (lej)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting Plaintiff's IFP Application #1 . Service is not appropriate at this time. If Plaintiff wishes to amend his complaint, he may complete the new complaint form in its entirety in accordance with this order, mark it as "Amended Complaint," and file it within 30 days of the date of this order. Plaintiff's complaint, as it now stands, is deficient, and may be dismissed after 30 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 12/30/2019. (lej)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Craighead County Jail filed by Byron Martin. (llg)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Byron Martin. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?