Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. White River Medical Corporation
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: White River Medical Corporation and White River Medical Corporation doing business as White River Health System
Case Number: 3:2020cv00049
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:626
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by White River Medical Corporation.(Heller, Christopher)
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to White River Medical Corporation by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Dixon, Pamela)
March 2, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #2 Summons Returned Executed. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the description to indicate the document was filed in error - duplicate entry of #3 Waiver of Service. (kbc)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to White River Medical Corporation by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Dixon, Pamela)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD (duplicate entry). (Dixon, Pamela) Docket text modified on 3/2/2020 to correct description. (kbc)
February 11, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate "No summons issued". (thd)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission with Jury Demand against White River Medical Corporation. No summons issued.(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wbb) (Docket text modified on 2/11/2020 to indicate "No summons issued." (thd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. White River Medical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White River Medical Corporation
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White River Medical Corporation doing business as White River Health System
Represented By: Christopher J. Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Faye A. Williams
Represented By: Pamela B. Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?