Estate of De'Angelo Brown v. West et al
Plaintiff: Estate Of De'Angelo Brown
Defendant: Daniel Magill, James Presley, Matthew McKee, Michael Clark, Prince Bohanon, E.C. West, John Buford, James Presley, III and E C West
Case Number: 3:2020cv00099
Filed: March 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Filing 12 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 7/27/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/10/2020; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 5/17/2021 at 09:00 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) # 324 before Judge Kristine G. Baker. Signed at the direction of the Court on 05/27/2020. (tmw)
May 27, 2020 Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #10 Motion for Order filed by Prince Bohanon, John Buford, Michael Clark, Daniel Magill, Matthew McKee, James Presley, III, E C West. (Gibson, Gabrielle)
May 27, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Order by Prince Bohanon, John Buford, Michael Clark, Daniel Magill, Matthew McKee, James Presley, III, E C West (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Gibson, Gabrielle)
May 19, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Prince Bohanon, John Buford, Michael Clark, Daniel Magill, Matthew McKee, James Presley, III, E C West.(Gibson, Gabrielle)
May 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Gabrielle Denise Gibson on behalf of Prince Bohanon, John Buford, Michael Clark, Daniel Magill, Matthew McKee, James Presley, III, E C West (Gibson, Gabrielle)
May 12, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint , filed by Estate of De'Angelo Brown. Matthew McKee served on 5/1/2020. (Kitchens, Lloyd)
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint , filed by Estate of De'Angelo Brown. Daniel Magill served on 5/1/2020. (Kitchens, Lloyd)
May 12, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint , filed by Estate of De'Angelo Brown. Michael Clark served on 5/6/2020. (Kitchens, Lloyd)
May 12, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint , filed by Estate of De'Angelo Brown. John Buford served on 5/1/2020. (Kitchens, Lloyd)
May 4, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint , filed by Estate of De'Angelo Brown. E C West served on 4/29/2020. (Kitchens, Lloyd)
May 4, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint , filed by Estate of De'Angelo Brown. Prince Bohanon served on 4/29/2020. (Kitchens, Lloyd)
March 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against all Defendants filed by he Estate Of De'Angelo Brown, Deceased. (Fee of $400 paid, receipt #JON000892.) Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of De'Angelo Brown v. West et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Magill
Represented By: Gabrielle Denise Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Presley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew McKee
Represented By: Gabrielle Denise Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Clark
Represented By: Gabrielle Denise Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prince Bohanon
Represented By: Gabrielle Denise Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.C. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Buford
Represented By: Gabrielle Denise Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Presley, III
Represented By: Gabrielle Denise Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E C West
Represented By: Gabrielle Denise Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate Of De'Angelo Brown
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?