CWC Mechanical LLC v. Copeland
Plaintiff: CWC Mechanical LLC
Defendant: Brent Copeland
Case Number: 3:2020cv00101
Filed: March 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas W. Brimhall on behalf of Brent Copeland. (wbb)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/15/2020 and Jury Trial set for 6/28/2021 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro, Arkansas Courtroom (large) #324 before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 4/24/2020. (hml)
April 24, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #3 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the file date as 4/23/2020 as marked on the document. (jak)
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #3 Answer. (thd)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Brent Copeland.(wbb) (Docket entry modified on 4/24/2020 to correct the file date) (jak)
April 13, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by CWC Mechanical LLC. Brent Copeland served on 4/2/2020. (Orcutt, Amanda)
March 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Brent Copeland filed by CWC Mechanical LLC. (Fee $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT076637.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CWC Mechanical LLC v. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CWC Mechanical LLC
Represented By: Amanda Gale Orcutt
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Copeland
Represented By: Douglas W. Brimhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?