State Farm Fire & Casualty Company v. Young et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Defendant: Leann Young and Young Karma Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv00114
Filed: April 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 5/28/2020. (jak)
May 13, 2020 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 Response to Motion to Transfer filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Strabala, Richard)
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case to Delta Division of Eastern District of Arkansas filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strabala, Richard)
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #2 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company.(Strabala, Richard)
May 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #5 Brief in Support. CORRECTION: The original document was submitted in error (wrong image file). The correct document was added to docket entry #5 based on the attached correspondence. (jak)
May 11, 2020 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 Transfer Case to Delta Division of the Eastern District of Arkansas filed by Leann Young, Young Karma Inc. (Perry, Joseph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct (submitted 5/11/2020)) (jak).
May 11, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Transfer Case to Delta Division of Eastern District of Arkansas by Leann Young, Young Karma Inc (Perry, Joseph)
May 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Leann Young, Young Karma Inc Demand for Trial byJury (Perry, Joseph)
May 11, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against State Farm Fire & Casualty Company by Leann Young, Young Karma Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Copy of Insurance Policy)(Perry, Joseph)
April 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid, Receipt #LIT076823.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company v. Young et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leann Young
Represented By: Joseph Robert Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young Karma Inc
Represented By: Joseph Robert Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: John E. Moore
Represented By: Richard Shane Strabala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?