Foster et al v. Rick Shipman Construction Inc
Plaintiff: Terry Foster and Janie Brewer
Defendant: Rick Shipman Construction Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv00135
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 7/27/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/10/2020; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 11/1/2021 at 09:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) # 324 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 06/24/2020. (rmg)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Rick Shipman Construction Inc (Wilson, Ryan)
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Rick Shipman Construction Inc.(wbb)
May 18, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Rick Shipman Construction Inc filed by Terry Foster & Janie Brewer.(wbb)
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rick Shipman Construction Inc from Randolph County Circuit Court, case number 61CV-2020-36. Fee of $400 paid, receipt #JON000901. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster et al v. Rick Shipman Construction Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Foster
Represented By: Larry J. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janie Brewer
Represented By: Larry J. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Shipman Construction Inc
Represented By: Ryan M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?