Simmons v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: Charles H Simmons
Defendant: Dakota Westerfield, Daniel T Sweeney, Jeremy Haverstick, Ricky Davis, J Dauck, Gary Musselwhite and Young
Case Number: 3:2020cv00138
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Northern Division Office
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court. (csf)
July 14, 2020 Filing 21 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #20 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Gary Musselwhite, Young. (Land, Amanda)
July 14, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Gary Musselwhite, Young (Land, Amanda)
July 14, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Denise Land on behalf of Gary Musselwhite, Young (Land, Amanda)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #17 Motion for admissions and default judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/8/2020. (csf)
July 6, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Default Judgment against J Dauck, Ricky Davis, Jeremy Haverstick, Daniel T Sweeney, Dakota Westerfield by Charles H Simmons. (ljb)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #15 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/29/2020. (csf)
June 26, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Charles H Simmons. (kdr)
June 26, 2020 Filing 14 REQUEST for Production of Documents by Charles H Simmons.(kdr)
June 25, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #13 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to remove duplicate text. (jak)
June 23, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by J Dauck, Ricky Davis, Jeremy Haverstick, Daniel T Sweeney, Dakota Westerfield.(Land, Amanda) (Docket text modified on 6/25/2020 to remove duplicate text)(jak)
June 11, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed. J Dauck served on 6/2/2020. (fjg)
June 11, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Ricky Davis served on 6/2/2020. (fjg)
June 11, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Jeremy Haverstick served on 6/2/2020. (fjg)
June 11, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Daniel T Sweeney served on 6/2/2020. (fjg)
June 11, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Dakota Westerfield served on 6/2/2020. (fjg)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summonses for Defendants Musselwhite and Young. The Marshal is directed to serve each Defendant with a copy of the #2 Complaint and #5 Amended Complaint with any attachments without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 6/8/2020. (jak)
June 8, 2020 Summons Issued as to Gary Musselwhite, Young and forwarded to USMS for service. (ajt)
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Denise Land on behalf of J Dauck, Ricky Davis, Jeremy Haverstick, Daniel T Sweeney, Dakota Westerfield (Land, Amanda)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Charles H Simmons. (ljb)
May 20, 2020 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (jbh)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summonses for defendant Davis, Haverstick, Westerfield, Sweeney, Dauck, and Davis. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve each Defendant with a summons and copy of #2 Complaint with any attachments without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 5/20/2020. (jak)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS granting #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's custodian is directed to collect an initial partial filing fee of $17.70 and to collect future monthly installments from plaintiff's prison trust account and forward them to the Clerk of the Court until a total of $350 has been paid. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the Grimes Unit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 5/20/2020. (jak)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Charles H Simmons. (llg)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Charles H Simmons. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dakota Westerfield
Represented By: Amanda Denise Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel T Sweeney
Represented By: Amanda Denise Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Haverstick
Represented By: Amanda Denise Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Davis
Represented By: Amanda Denise Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Dauck
Represented By: Amanda Denise Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Musselwhite
Represented By: Amanda Denise Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young
Represented By: Amanda Denise Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles H Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?