Peco Foods Inc v. Maines Paper & Food Service Inc
Plaintiff: Peco Foods Inc
Defendant: Maines Paper and Food Service Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv00140
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Pursuant to the #3 notice of bankruptcy, this case is stayed. The parties are ordered to file a status update within 120 days. Failure to file a status update will result in this case being dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/6/2020. (jbh)
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Maines Paper & Food Service, Inc. by Peco Foods Inc (Carmody, Stephen)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peco Foods Inc. Maines Paper & Food Service Inc served on 6/4/2020. (Carmody, Stephen)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Maines Paper and Food Service Inc filed by Peco Foods Inc. Fee $400 received. Receipt Number LIT077333. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peco Foods Inc v. Maines Paper & Food Service Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peco Foods Inc
Represented By: Stephen J. Carmody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maines Paper and Food Service Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?