Quinton v. Armstrong et al
Plaintiff: Kevin D Quinton, Sr
Defendant: Shiela Armstrong, Aric Simmons, Tommy Allen, Carpenter and Wood
Case Number: 3:2020cv00146
Filed: May 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an amended complaint against Defendants Carpenter and Wood within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/14/2020. (jak)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #7 motion to appoint counsel. In its #12 7/8/2020 Order adopting the recommendation, the Court failed to rule on Quinton's motion to appoint counsel. The Court adopts that piece of the recommendation as well. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/9/2020. (jbh)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER adopting #8 recommendation; overruling #11 Objections; dismissing without prejudice Quinton's claims against defendants Simmons, Allen, and Armstrong; granting #10 motion to amend; directing the Clerk to add Carpenter and Wood to the docket; and returning this case to Magisrtate Judge Kearney to set a deadline for Quinton's final amendment, and for service or a recommendation about Carpenter and Wood in due course. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 07/08/2020. (ajt)
June 29, 2020 Filing 11 OBJECTION to #8 Report and Recommendations by Kevin D Quinton, Sr. (kdr)
June 29, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend #2 Complaint by Kevin D Quinton, Sr. (ljb)
June 23, 2020 Filing 9 ADDENDUM to #6 Amended Complaint filed by Kevin D Quinton, Sr. (ljb)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending #6 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint against Defendants be DISMISSED, for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. #7 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel be DENIED. Dismissal of this action constitute a "strike" within the meaning of the Prison Litigation Reform Act. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from an Order and Judgment dismissing this action would not be taken in good faith. Objections are due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 6/18/2020. (lmc)
June 15, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kevin D Quinton, Sr. (llg)
June 15, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Kevin D Quinton, Sr. (llg)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's present custodian is directed to collect an initial partial filing fee of $15.25 and forward that amount along with future monthly payments from plaintiff's institutional account until the total of $350 has been collected. Plaintiff is directed to file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this Order. The clerk shall mail plaintiff the Court-provided 1983 complaint form. The Clerk shall also mail a copy of this Order to the Arkansas Department of Correction Compliance Office, the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, and the Warden of the Ouachita River Unit. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/27/2020. (jak)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 05/27/2020. (lmc)
May 26, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Kevin D Quinton, Sr. (ljb)
May 26, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kevin D Quinton, Sr. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quinton v. Armstrong et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shiela Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aric Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin D Quinton, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?