Dixon v. Monsanto Company et al
Plaintiff: Ray Dixon and Ray Dixon, Jr
Defendant: BASF SE, BASF Corporation and Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00159
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 E-MAIL received from Eastern District of Missouri confirming the case was received and opened in their district as case number 1:20-cv-00137. (kbc)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-14) transferring this case to the U.S. District Court Eastern District of Missouri as part of MDL No. 2820 In Re: Dicamba Herbicides Litigation. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 6/19/2020. (jak)
June 19, 2020 Docket Note: Pursuant to #2 Conditional Transfer Order, this case was transferred to the U.S. District Court Eastern District of Missouri on this date as part of MDL No. 2820 In Re: Dicamba Herbicides Litigation. (jak)
June 11, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct Plaintiff's name to be "Ray Dixon Jr." (thd)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Ray Dixon Jr (Fee $400. Receipt Number JON000905. Summons issued and returned to Plaintiff's counsel for service) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak) (Docket text modified on 6/11/2020 to correct Plaintiff's name.) (thd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF SE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Dixon
Represented By: Don M. Downing
Represented By: Kaitlin Ann Bridges
Represented By: Gretchen Garrison
Represented By: Thomas K. Neill
Represented By: Jason D. Sapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Dixon, Jr
Represented By: Kaitlin Ann Bridges
Represented By: Thomas K. Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?