Guthrie v. Arkansas, State of et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Guthrie
Defendant: Mark Counts, Serena Martin, Arkansas Supreme Court, Ryan Cooper, Joe Grider, III, Arkansas, State of, Harold Erwin, Michelle Huff, Henry Boyce, Tim Metzin and Bobby Glen
Case Number: 3:2020cv00214
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Thomas Guthrie.(kdr)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's present custodian is directed to collect monthly payments from his institutional account and forward them to the Clerk of Court until a total of $350 has been paid. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Jail Administrator, Sharp County Detention Center. Service is not appropriate at this time. The Clerk shall mail Plaintiff a 1983 complaint form along with a copy of this Order. If Plaintiff wishes to amend his complaint, he may complete the new form and file it within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 8/24/2020. (jak)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thomas Guthrie. (ljb)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Plaintiff must submit either the $400 filing fee or a complete Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit within 30 days of the date of this order. Failure to do one or the other will result in the dismissal of this case without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit along with a copy of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 7/27/2020. (lej)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The original document was submitted in error (wrong image file) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to #1 and hereto for service/review by the parties. (kbc)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Thomas Guthrie.(kdr) Additional attachment added on 7/24/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct. (kbc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guthrie v. Arkansas, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Counts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serena Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Grider, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Erwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Huff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Metzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Glen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Guthrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?