Rollins v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Tiffany Rollins
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2020cv00239
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Patricia S Harris
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric B. Tucker on behalf of Social Security Administration (Tucker, Eric)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tiffany Rollins. Social Security Administration served on 9/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wallace, Stephanie)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/3/2020. (jak)
August 20, 2020 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to counsel for service. (wbb)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Tiffany Rollins has filed a pleading that the Clerk of the Court has construed as a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. See Docket Entry #1 . The Court has reviewed the motion and finds that it should be, and is, granted. Plaintiff may proceed without the prepayment of fees or costs or the giving of security. The Clerk of the Court shall issue summons to plaintiff, and plaintiff shall served the appropriate parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 8/20/2020. (cfd)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed by Tiffany Rollins against Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wbb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tiffany Rollins. (wbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rollins v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Represented By: Eric B. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Rollins
Represented By: Stephanie Bartels Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?