Everett v. Payne et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Everett
Defendant: Dexter Payne, Jackson, Raymond Naylor and Keith Waddle
Case Number: 3:2020cv00243
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jak)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 JUDGMENT: Everett's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/29/2020. (jak)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER adopting #4 Recommendation. #5 Motion to amend is denied. Evertt's complaint will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. This dismissal counts as a "strike" and an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/29/2020. (jak)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 OBJECTION to #4 Proposed Findings and Recommendations by Christopher Everett. (ljb)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Correct #2 Complaint by Christopher Everett. (ljb)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. It is recommended that plaintiff's #2 complaint be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Dismissal of this action should count as a "strike" and the Court should certify that an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order adopting these recommendations and the accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 8/24/2020. (jak)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's custodian is directed to collect monthly payments from Plaintiff's prison trust account and forward them to the Clerk of Court until the $350 statutory filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the North Central Unit, the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, and the ADC Compliance Office. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 8/24/2020. (jak)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Christopher Everett.(kdr)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Everett. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Everett v. Payne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Naylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Waddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?