Everett et al v. Tate et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Everett
Defendant: Shawn Stephens, Sissy Wilson, Jeffrey Tate, Aron Moody and Bobby Tate
Case Number: 3:2020cv00244
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Strike #18 Reply (Non Motion) by Aron Moody, Shawn Stephens, Bobby Tate, Sissy Wilson (Thomas, JaNan)
October 6, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition to #15 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Christopher Everett. (llg)
October 6, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to #17 Answer on Complaint by Christopher Everett. (llg)
October 5, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #17 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to remove duplicate text. (jak)
October 2, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint, #2 Complaint by Aron Moody, Shawn Stephens, Bobby Tate, Sissy Wilson.(Thomas, JaNan) (Docket text modified on 10/5/2020 to remove duplicate text)(jak)
October 2, 2020 Filing 16 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #15 Motion to Dismiss filed by Aron Moody, Shawn Stephens, Bobby Tate, Sissy Wilson. (Thomas, JaNan)
October 2, 2020 Filing 15 First MOTION to Dismiss by Aron Moody, Shawn Stephens, Bobby Tate, Sissy Wilson (Thomas, JaNan)
October 2, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by JaNan Arnold Thomas on behalf of Aron Moody, Shawn Stephens, Bobby Tate, Sissy Wilson (Thomas, JaNan)
September 22, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Sissy Wilson served on 9/15/2020. (fjg)
September 22, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Jeffrey Tate served on 9/15/2020. (fjg)
September 22, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Aron Moody served on 9/15/2020. (fjg)
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Bobby Tate served on 9/15/2020. (fjg)
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Shawn Stephens served on 9/15/2020. (fjg)
September 9, 2020 Summons Reissued as to Jeffrey Tate and forwarded to USMS for service. (ajt)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion. The Clerk of Court is directed to prepare a new summons for Batesville Police Officer Jeffrey Tate. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve Officer Tate with a summons, #2 Complaint, and a copy of the #4 Amended Complaint without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 9/9/2020. (jak)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Correct Summons by Christopher Everett. (llg)
August 31, 2020 Summons Issued as to Aron Moody, Shawn Stephens, Bobby Tate, Jeffrey Tate, Sissy Wilson and forwarded to the USMS for service. (ajt)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summonses for all Defendants. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the Defendants with summonses, copies of the #2 Complaint, with any attachments, and the #4 Amended Complaint without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/31/2020. (jak)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS. Granting #1 motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's custodians are directed to collect monthly payments from his prison trust account and forward them to the Clerk of Court until a total of $350 has been collected. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Arkansas Division of Correction Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the Arkansas Division of Correction Compliance Division, and the Warden of the North Central Unit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/27/2020. (jak)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Christopher Everett. (llg)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION by Christopher Everett. (llg)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Christopher Everett.(kdr)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher Everett.(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Everett et al v. Tate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Stephens
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sissy Wilson
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aron Moody
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Tate
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?