Cannon v. Bowers et al
Plaintiff: Demario S Cannon
Defendant: Toni Raymond, Marty Boyd and Keith Bowers
Case Number: 3:2020cv00344
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Filing 5 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jak)
December 3, 2020 Filing 4 JUDGMENT: Cannon's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/3/2020. (jak)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER withdrawing the reference. Plaintiff's complaint will be dismissed without prejudice. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/3/2020. (jak)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that Plaintiff must submit either the $400 filing fee or a complete Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit within 30 days of the date of this order. His failure to do one or the other will result in the dismissal of this case without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit along with a copy of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/29/2020. (lej)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Demario S Cannon.(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cannon v. Bowers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demario S Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toni Raymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?