LeFors v. Boyd et al
Plaintiff: Herman H LeFors, Jr
Defendant: Dexter Payne, Keith Bowers and Marty Boyd
Case Number: 3:2020cv00373
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Patricia S Harris
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiff LeFors is granted an extension of time to file his amended complaint. LeFors' amended complaint is to be filed with the court by February 14, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 1/12/2021. (cfd)
January 12, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time by Herman H LeFors, Jr. (llg)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion to Extend Time. The Clerk of Court is directed to send LeFors a blank 1983 complaint form. In the event LeFors fails to file an amended complaint conforming to thisorder within thirty days, the Court will consider recommending that this case be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 12/14/2020. (wbb)
December 7, 2020 Filing 8 JUDICIAL NOTICE by Herman H LeFors, Jr. (ljb)
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Extend Time by Herman H LeFors, Jr. (ljb)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Copies. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff three blank s. 1983 forms. The Court has not finished screening Plaintiff's complaint to determine whether service of some or all of Plaintiff's claims are appropriate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 11/30/2020. (cfd)
November 30, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Copies by Herman H LeFors, Jr. (llg)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER PLAINTIFFS. Granting #1 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's custodian is directed to collect monthly payments from his institutional account and forward to the Clerk of Court until a total of $350 has been paid. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Craighead county Sheriff. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 11/19/2020. (jak)
November 17, 2020 Filing 3 ADDENDUM/DECLARATION in Support of #2 Complaint filed by Herman H LeFors, Jr. (kdr)
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Herman H LeFors, Jr.(kdr)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Herman H LeFors, Jr. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LeFors v. Boyd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dexter Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman H LeFors, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?