Magic Touch Corporation v. Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Magic Touch Corporation
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company and Nationwide Insurance Company Of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv00374
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/21/2021. Jury Trial set for 6/13/2022 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 12/7/2020. (slb)
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/21/2021. Jury Trial set for 6/13/2022 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 12/7/2020. (slb)
December 2, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company.(Reviere, Russell)
November 23, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal and #2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text for each entry was modified to correct Defendant's name to be Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (thd)
November 19, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Magic Touch Corporation against Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company. (wbb) (Docket text modified on 11/23/2020 to correct Defendant's name.) (thd).
November 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company from Circuit Court Of Craighead County, case number 16JCV-20-982. Fee of $400 paid, receipt #JON000928. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wbb) (Docket text modified on 11/23/2020 to correct Defendant's name.)(thd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magic Touch Corporation v. Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Russell E. Reviere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Russell E. Reviere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Insurance Company Of America
Represented By: Russell E. Reviere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magic Touch Corporation
Represented By: Mark Wesley Rees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?