McGlothlin v. Minnesota Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Bud Willie McGlothlin
Defendant: Minnesota Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00379
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Minnesota Life Insurance Company (Campbell, Katherine)
November 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Church Campbell on behalf of Minnesota Life Insurance Company (Campbell, Katherine)
November 27, 2020 Filing 4 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that #1 Notice of Removal lacks an original signature (F.R.Cv.P. 11 (a) and Local Rule 5.5 (c)(1)). (thd)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Minnesota Life Insurance Company.(bmd)
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT against Minnesota Life Insurance Company filed by Bud Willie McGlothlin.(bmd)
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Minnesota Life Insurance Company from Independence County Circuit Court, case number 32CV-20-185. Fee $400 received, receipt number LIT079869. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2020: #2 Main Document - Correct) (cmn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGlothlin v. Minnesota Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bud Willie McGlothlin
Represented By: Timothy F. Watson, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Katherine Church Campbell
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?