Pengould LLC v. Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Pengould LLC
Defendant: Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00006
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #6 Second Initial Scheduling Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the proposed trial date as 3/17/2022 as marked on the Order.(jak)
February 12, 2021 Filing 6 SECOND INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 4/22/2021. Rule 26(f) Report due by 5/6/2021. *Jury Trial reset for 3/17/2022 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) # 324 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 2/12/21. (mmb) (Docket text modified on 3/8/2021 to correct the trial date)(jak)
February 10, 2021 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 4/20/2021. Rule 26(f) Report due by 5/4/2021. Jury Trial set for 3/16/2021 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) # 324 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Entered at the direction of the Court on 2/10/21. (mmb)
February 10, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company (Younger, Robert)
February 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by E. B. Chiles, IV on behalf of Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company (Chiles, E.)
February 10, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Younger, Robert)
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company filed by Pengould LLC. Fee $402; Receipt No. JON000937. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pengould LLC v. Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pengould LLC
Represented By: Jason A. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?