Cool Pet Stuff LLC v. Pets First Inc
Plaintiff: Cool Pet Stuff LLC
Defendant: Pets First Inc doing business as Pets First Of New Jersey Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv00054
Filed: March 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Filing 12 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #11 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Pets First Inc. (Moore, Barrett)
April 16, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Pets First Inc. (Moore, Barrett)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Extend Time to Respond until April 16, 2021. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 3/30/2021. (sjh)
March 25, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Remand, Doc No. 5, and Incorporated Brief in Support filed by Cool Pet Stuff LLC. (Steadman, Timothy)
March 25, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to #5 Motion to Remand and Incorporated Brief in Support by Pets First Inc (Moore, Barrett) (Docket text modified on 3/25/2021 to establish linkage) (jak)
March 25, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #8 MOTION to Extend Time. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to establish linkage to #5 Motion to Remand.(jak)
March 19, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cool Pet Stuff LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit Distributor Agreement, #3 Exhibit Correspondence between John Holleman and Neil Flynn re; request for extension to respond to the complaint, #4 Exhibit Correspondence and stipulation from Neil Flynn re; extension, #5 Exhibit Correspondence between John Holleman and Neil Flynn re; second request for extension to respond to the complaint)(Steadman, Timothy)
March 19, 2021 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 Remand to State Court, filed by Cool Pet Stuff LLC. (Steadman, Timothy)
March 19, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Cool Pet Stuff LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Correspondence between John Holleman and Neil Flynn re; request for extension to respond to the complaint, #2 Exhibit Correspondence and stipulation from Neil Flynn re; extension, #3 Exhibit Correspondence between John Holleman and Neil Flynn re; second request for extension to respond to the complaint)(Steadman, Timothy)
March 5, 2021 Filing 4 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #3 Motion to Dismiss filed by Pets First Inc. (wbb)
March 5, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Pets First Inc. (wbb)
March 5, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Pets First Inc filed by Cool Pet Stuff LLC.(wbb)
March 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pets First Inc from Craighead County Circuit Court, case number 16JCV-20-01169. Fee of $402 paid, receipt #JON000947. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cool Pet Stuff LLC v. Pets First Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pets First Inc doing business as Pets First Of New Jersey Inc
Represented By: Alexandra C. Benton
Represented By: Barrett Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cool Pet Stuff LLC
Represented By: Timothy A. Steadman
Represented By: John Holleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?