Hampton v. Page et al
Plaintiff: Christian Hampton
Defendant: John Moss, Clinton Baker, Joe Page, Nathan Williams and Michael Cochran
Case Number: 3:2021cv00077
Filed: April 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Nathan Williams served on 5/5/2021. (mdo)
June 11, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Michael Cochran served on 5/5/2021. (mdo)
June 11, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Clinton Baker served on 5/5/2021. (mdo)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER finding that service is appropriate for defendant John Moss. The Clerk of the Court shall prepare a summons for the Defendant and the U.S. Marshal is hereby directed to serve a copy of the #2 Complaint and summons on defendant without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/27/2021. (jak)
May 27, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE, CONSENT AND REFERENCE to a Magistrate Judge forwarded by the Clerk of Court to the parties. (lmc)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall complete discovery on or before 11/27/2021 and file any dispositive motions on or before 12/27/2021. A Motion based on failure to exhaust must be filed by 07/27/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/27/2021. (lmc)
May 27, 2021 Summons Issued as to John Moss and forwarded to USMS for service. (ajt)
May 26, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Clinton Baker, Michael Cochran, Nathan Williams.(Adkins, Reid)
May 26, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Reid Phillip Adkins on behalf of Clinton Baker, Michael Cochran, Nathan Williams (Adkins, Reid)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER adopting and partly declining #4 partial recommendation; declining the recommendation as to Defendant Moss; adopting the recommendation as to Defendant Page; and dismissing Plaintiff's claims against Page without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/20/2021. (jbh)
May 10, 2021 Filing 7 OBJECTIONS to #4 Proposed Findings and Recommendations by Christian Hampton. (llg)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The Director of the ADC or his/her designee shall collect from Plaintiff's prison trust account an initial partial filing fee of $74.48 and forward that amount along with future monthly payments to the Clerk of Court until a total of $350 has been paid. Service is appropriate for defendants Nathan Williams, Michael Cochran, and Clinton Baker. The Clerk of the Court shall prepare summons for the Defendants and the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the #2 Complaint and summons on Defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Plaintiff's #3 Motion to appoint counsel is denied without prejudice. The Clerk shall forward a copy of this Order to the ADC Compliance Office, the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, and the Warden of the Varner Super Max Unit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/23/2021. (jak)(Docket text modified on 4/26/2021 to correct a typographical error)(jak)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/23/2021. (jak)
April 23, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendants Joe Page and John Moss be dismissed without prejudice, for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Objections due 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/23/2021. (jak)
April 23, 2021 Summons Issued as to Clinton Baker, Michael Cochran, Nathan Williams and forwarded to USMS for service. (ajt)
April 21, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Christian Hampton. (ljb)
April 21, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Christian Hampton. (ljb)
April 21, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christian Hampton. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hampton v. Page et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton Baker
Represented By: Reid Phillip Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Williams
Represented By: Reid Phillip Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cochran
Represented By: Reid Phillip Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?