Wilson et al v. Walmart Inc et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Sanders, Ashley Popa, Jolina Manley, Susan Canada, Jessica David, Leslie Ainsworth, Heather Lowrey, Cassandra Martell, Teresa Wilson and Tabatha Sidi
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive and Walmart Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv00082
Filed: April 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Scott G. Braden. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4041245. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Bates, Joseph)
June 23, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Katrina Carroll. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4041222. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Bates, Joseph)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motions, Doc. #13 - #17 , granted. Shayne Henry, Christopher W. Keegan, Austin Klar, Donna M. Welch, and Michael F. Williams are admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/21/2021. (slb)
June 18, 2021 Filing 19 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Walmart Inc. (Quattlebaum, Steven)
June 18, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Walmart Inc (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix A)(Quattlebaum, Steven)
June 18, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Michael F. Williams. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4037722. Filed by Walmart Inc (Quattlebaum, Steven)
June 18, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Donna M. Welch. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4037721. Filed by Walmart Inc (Quattlebaum, Steven)
June 18, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Austin Klar. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4037720. Filed by Walmart Inc (Quattlebaum, Steven)
June 18, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Christopher W. Keegan. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4037719. Filed by Walmart Inc (Quattlebaum, Steven)
June 18, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Shayne Henry. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4037716. Filed by Walmart Inc (Quattlebaum, Steven)
May 14, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon B. Cate on behalf of Walmart Inc (Cate, Brandon)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Joint motion, Doc. #9 , granted. Answer or Rule 12(b) motion due by 18 June 2021. Plaintiffs' response to any motion to dismiss due by 23 July 2021. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/14/2021. (slb)
May 13, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Tull, III on behalf of Walmart Inc (Tull, John)
May 13, 2021 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint and, if Defendant Moves to Dismiss, to File Plaintiffs' Opposition by Walmart Inc (Quattlebaum, Steven)
May 13, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Autumn Powell on behalf of Walmart Inc (Powell, Meredith)
May 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven W. Quattlebaum on behalf of Walmart Inc (Quattlebaum, Steven)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motion, Doc. #5 , granted. Michael A. Tompkins is admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/12/2021. (slb)
May 11, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Michael A. Tompkins. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4008230. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Document Declaration)(Bates, Joseph)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Motion, Doc. #3 , granted. Todd D. Carpenter is admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/7/2021. (slb)
May 5, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Todd D. Carpenter. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4004565. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Document Declaration)(Bates, Joseph)
May 3, 2021 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons , filed by Ashley Popa, Heather Lowrey, Jessica David, Leslie Ainsworth, Susan Canada, Ryan Sanders, Tabatha Sidi, Teresa Wilson, Cassandra Martell, Jolina Manley. Walmart Inc served on 4/28/2021. (Bates, Joseph)
April 28, 2021 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Ashley Popa, Heather Lowrey, Jessica David, Leslie Ainsworth, Susan Canada, Ryan Sanders, Tabatha Sidi, Teresa Wilson, Cassandra Martell, and Jolina Manley. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. ( Filing Fee of $402 paid. Receipt #LIT081857.) (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson et al v. Walmart Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Represented By: Meredith Autumn Powell
Represented By: Christopher W. Keegan
Represented By: Austin Klar
Represented By: Brandon B. Cate
Represented By: Michael F. Williams
Represented By: John E. Tull, III
Represented By: Shayne Hunter Henry
Represented By: Steven W. Quattlebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Sanders
Represented By: Michael A. Tompkins
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Brett R. Cohen
Represented By: Scott G. Braden
Represented By: Todd D. Carpenter
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Brown
Represented By: Katrina Carroll
Represented By: Michael Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Popa
Represented By: Michael A. Tompkins
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Brett R. Cohen
Represented By: Scott G. Braden
Represented By: Todd D. Carpenter
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Brown
Represented By: Katrina Carroll
Represented By: Michael Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jolina Manley
Represented By: Michael A. Tompkins
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Brett R. Cohen
Represented By: Scott G. Braden
Represented By: Todd D. Carpenter
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Brown
Represented By: Katrina Carroll
Represented By: Michael Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Canada
Represented By: Michael A. Tompkins
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Brett R. Cohen
Represented By: Scott G. Braden
Represented By: Todd D. Carpenter
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Brown
Represented By: Katrina Carroll
Represented By: Michael Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica David
Represented By: Michael A. Tompkins
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Brett R. Cohen
Represented By: Scott G. Braden
Represented By: Todd D. Carpenter
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Brown
Represented By: Katrina Carroll
Represented By: Michael Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Ainsworth
Represented By: Michael A. Tompkins
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Brett R. Cohen
Represented By: Scott G. Braden
Represented By: Todd D. Carpenter
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Brown
Represented By: Katrina Carroll
Represented By: Michael Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Lowrey
Represented By: Michael A. Tompkins
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Brett R. Cohen
Represented By: Scott G. Braden
Represented By: Todd D. Carpenter
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Brown
Represented By: Katrina Carroll
Represented By: Michael Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Martell
Represented By: Michael A. Tompkins
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Brett R. Cohen
Represented By: Scott G. Braden
Represented By: Todd D. Carpenter
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Brown
Represented By: Katrina Carroll
Represented By: Michael Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Wilson
Represented By: Michael A. Tompkins
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Brett R. Cohen
Represented By: Scott G. Braden
Represented By: Todd D. Carpenter
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Brown
Represented By: Katrina Carroll
Represented By: Michael Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabatha Sidi
Represented By: Michael A. Tompkins
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Brett R. Cohen
Represented By: Scott G. Braden
Represented By: Todd D. Carpenter
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Brown
Represented By: Katrina Carroll
Represented By: Michael Tompkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?