Howard v. WestRock Company et al
Plaintiff: Josh Howard
Defendant: John Does and WestRock Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00094
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/16/2021. Jury Trial set for 12/12/2022 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom #324 before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 6/3/2021. (slb)
May 28, 2021 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) DOCKET NOTE: This case is assigned to the docket of United States District Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin is now associated to this case due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Beth Deere. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 5/28/2021. (jbh)
May 18, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by WestRock Company.(Drennon, Baxter)
May 12, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Josh Howard.(ajt)
May 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WestRock Company from Greene County Circuit Court, case number 28CV-21-48. Fee $402 paid, receipt number LIT082101. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. WestRock Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Howard
Represented By: Anthony Bryce Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WestRock Company
Represented By: Gordon S. Rather, Jr.
Represented By: Baxter D. Drennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?