Arriola v. Greenwich Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Michael Arriola and Michael A Arriola
Defendant: Greenwich Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00101
Filed: May 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 8/16/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/27/2021; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 1/9/2023 at 9:30 a.m. in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 6/7/2021. (ljb)
June 1, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Greenwich Insurance Company.(Frase, John)
May 27, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Michael A Arriola. Greenwich Insurance Company served on 4/26/2021.(Brewer, Anthony) (Docket text modified on 5/27/2021 to include the party and date served) (jak)
May 27, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #3 Affidavit of Service. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate that defendant Greenwich Insurance Company was served on 4/26/2021 as marked on the document. (jak)
May 26, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the party name "Michael A Arriola" as indicated by the document. (cmn)
May 26, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the case number as "Case Number 47BCV-21-70" as indicated by the complaint. (cmn)
May 25, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Greenwich Insurance Company, filed by Michael A Arriola.(kdr) (Docket text modified on 5/26/2021 to correct party name.)(cmn)
May 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Greenwich Insurance Company from Mississippi County Circuit Court, Case Number 47BCV-21-70. Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT082241. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) (Docket text modified on 5/26/2021 to correct the description.)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arriola v. Greenwich Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenwich Insurance Company
Represented By: John Frase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Arriola
Represented By: John M. Rainwater
Represented By: Anthony Bryce Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A Arriola
Represented By: Anthony Bryce Brewer
Represented By: John M. Rainwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?