Jones v. Al-Quddus LLC
Plaintiff: Hilda Jones
Defendant: Al-Quddus LLC doing business as Days Inn Newport
Case Number: 3:2021cv00137
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 11/3/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 11/16/2021; Jury Trial set for sometime during the week of 3/13/2023 at 9:30 a.m. in Jonesboro Courtroom #324 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 9/2/2021. (ljb)
August 30, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Al-Quddus LLC.(Donovan, David)
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Donovan on behalf of Al-Quddus LLC (Donovan, David)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hilda Jones. Al-Quddus LLC served on 8/10/2021. (Campbell, Sheila)
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Al-Quddus LLC, filed by Hilda Jones. Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT082969. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Al-Quddus LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilda Jones
Represented By: Sheila F. Campbell
Represented By: William M. Hatchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al-Quddus LLC doing business as Days Inn Newport
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?