Khan v. Greenbrier Companies Inc et al
Plaintiff: Muhammad Khan
Defendant: Greenbrier Companies Inc and Greenbrier Central LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00236
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 2/3/2022. Jury Trial set for 10/16/2023 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom #324 before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 12/20/2021. (slb)
December 17, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to establish linkage to #1 Complaint.(cmn)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Greenbrier Central LLC, Greenbrier Companies Inc.(Buckley, Mary) (Docket text modified on 12/17/2021 to establish linkage.)(cmn)
December 6, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons , filed by Muhammad Khan. Greenbrier Companies Inc served on 11/23/2021. (Turner, Robert)
December 6, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Muhammad Khan. Greenbrier Central LLC served on 11/24/2021. (Turner, Robert)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Muhammad Khan. Fee $402; Receipt No. JON001015. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khan v. Greenbrier Companies Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad Khan
Represented By: B. Alan Matthews
Represented By: Joseph Russ Bryant
Represented By: Robert Emmett Turner, IV
Represented By: Benjamin Alan Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenbrier Companies Inc
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenbrier Central LLC
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?